judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GIANNINI VS. GIANNINI

Case Information: 42015
Short Caption:GIANNINI VS. GIANNINICourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 44476
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D224215Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/18/2003 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/10/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Stephen R. Minagil, Ltd.--check no. 2343.
09/10/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-15166
09/18/2003Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/26/2003Other Returned Unfiled Document.
10/02/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-16403
10/03/2003Notice/Outgoing Letter. Ara H. Shirinian. (docketing statement)
10/23/2003MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for the Respondent. 03-17704
10/30/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. for Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Respondent. 03-18146
12/16/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. to Withdraw. Attorney Donn W. Prokopius has moved for leave to withdraw as counsel of record for respondent. Respondent has been served with a copy of the motion. Cause appearing, we grant the unopposed motion. See SCR 166(2)(d),(e). The clerk shall remove Mr. Prokopius as counsel of record for respondent. Respondent shall have 60 days from the date of this order to retain new counsel and cause new counsel to enter an appearance with this court. Within the same time period, if respondent will not be retaining new counsel, she shall so inform this court. New counsel, if retained, will be required to participate in the settlement conference program. 03-20946
02/26/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. Settlement Judge recommends that this appeal be removed from the Settlement Conference program and proceed to briefing. 04-03679
03/17/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Removing Appeal from Settlement Conference Program and Reinstating Briefing. Transcript request due: 15 days. Opening brief and appendix: 120 days. On December 16, 2003, this court entered an order directing respondent to retain new counsel and cause new counsel to file a notice of appearance with this court or to inform this court if she does not intend to retain counsel. As of the date of this order, respondent has not communicated with this court in any manner. It appears respondent will not be retaining counsel in this appeal. Accordingly, this appeal shall be submitted for decision upon the filing of the opening brief and appendix. 04-05010
03/29/2004Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 04-05875
04/09/2004MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 04-06638
04/23/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Pursuant to the motion for voluntary dismissal filed on April 9, 2004, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 04-07562
04/23/2004Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.