judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LAS VEGAS PEACE OFFICERS VS. CITY OF LAS VEGAS

Case Information: 42000
Short Caption:LAS VEGAS PEACE OFFICERS VS. CITY OF LAS VEGASCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A466942Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/21/2003 / Reed, NathanielSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/08/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Victor M. Perri--check no. 12010.
09/08/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-14983
09/08/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
09/17/2003Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jerry J. Kaufman. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/17/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-15544
09/19/2003Notice/Outgoing Letter. Jerry J. Kaufman. (docketing statement)
09/19/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 03-15724
09/24/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Certified copy filed in district court on September 10, 2003. 03-15974
09/25/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Amended Docketing Statement. 03-16060
09/30/2003Notice/Outgoing Letter. Jerry J. Kaufman. (docketing statement)
10/15/2003Notice/Outgoing Letter. Jerry J. Kaufman. (Amended Notice of Appeal)
10/21/2003Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. New Settlement Judge: Nathaniel J. Reed.
12/09/2003Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 03-20484
12/22/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement. fn1[The settlement judge represents that the parties "have agreed to dismiss their appeal without prejudice." Parties may agree to voluntarily dismiss an appeal, see NRAP 42(b), this court will only dismiss an appeal with prejudice.] Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 03-21221
01/05/2004MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation for Dismissal of Appeal. 04-00188
02/02/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Stipulation Disapproved. On January 5, 2004, the parties filed a stipulation to dismiss the appeal. The parties agree to the dismissal of this appeal "without prejudice." This court will only dismiss an appeal with prejudice. Appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, file a stipulation or motion to dismiss this appeal with prejudice or the status of the appeal. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 04-02019
02/12/2004MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation for Dismissal of Appeal. 04-02820
03/23/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 04-05438
03/23/2004Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.