judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HOUSTON (HORACE) VS. STATE C/W 42046

Case Information: 42011
Short Caption:HOUSTON (HORACE) VS. STATE C/W 42046Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:42011*, 42046 Related Case(s): 41714 , 42039 , 42046 , 42067 , 47767 , 48884 , 51957 , 55607 , 65651 , 69629 , 69629-COA , 73884 , 73884-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C189058Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/06/2004How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/09/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/09/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 03-15100
09/10/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Judgment of Conviction filed on 9/8/03. Due Date: 10 days
09/18/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order/judgment of conviction filed in district court on September 8, 2003. 03-15616
10/01/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. If appellant is indigent, the district court shall have 30 days within which to appoint counsel for appellant. Otherwise, the district court shall order that, within 30 days, appellant must retain counsel and counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. Within 5 days from appointment or appearance of counsel the district court clerk shall transmit to this court a copy of the district court's written or minute order, and serve a copy of this order on appellant's counsel. Thereafter, counsel shall have 10 days to file a notice of appearance in this court. fn1[All filing deadlines shall commence to run from the date on which counsel is required to enter an appearance in this court.] 03-16309
10/14/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appointment of Counsel. Certified copy of notice from Clark County Clerk filed in district court on October 7, 2003. Craig A. Mueller appointed as counsel for appellant. 03-17056
10/16/2003Other Returned Mail. Order filed 10/01/03 addressed to Horace Houston returned. No forwarding address.
12/01/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On October 14, 2003, the district court filed a copy of an order appointing attorney Craig A. Mueller as counsel for appellant. To date, Mr. Mueller has not filed a notice of appearance. Mr. Mueller shall file a notice of appearance within 15 days from the date of this order. Within this same time period appellant shall file and serve the docketing statement and either a transcript request form or a certificate indicating that no transcripts are requested. Appellant shall have 120 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-19890
12/17/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Craig A. Mueller. 03-21039
12/17/2003Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: April 8, 2003 through August 28, 2003. Court Reporter: Tom Mercer. 03-21041
12/17/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-21042
12/17/2003MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 42011/42046. 03-21043
12/23/2003Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. to consolidate filed on December 17, 2003. The above-entitled appeals are consolidated for all appellate purposes. Pursuant to the order entered on December 1, 2003, in Docket No. 42011, appellant shall have until March 30, 2004, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Nos. 4201/42046. (03-21398) 03-21398
12/26/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Request for Rough Draft Transcripts). Nos. 42011/42046. 03-21451
04/02/2004BriefFiled Opening Brief. Nos. 42011/42046. 04-06149
05/07/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Nos. 42011/42046. 04-08560
05/20/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. To date, appellant has not filed the appendix to the opening brief. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file the appendix to the opening brief. Respondent has moved for an extension of time to file the answering brief for these consolidated appeals. Cause appearing, we grant the motion. The clerk shall file the answering brief received on May 18, 2004. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a reply brief, if deemed necessary. Nos. 42011/42026 04-09349
05/20/2004BriefFiled Answering Brief. Nos. 42011/42046. 04-09253
06/21/2004BriefFiled Reply Brief. Nos. 42011/42046. 04-11303
06/21/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Nos. 42011/42046. 04-11304
06/28/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Service of the Appellant's Reply Brief and Appendix. Nos. 42011/42046. (04-11829) 04-11829
07/06/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and these appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. Nos. 42011/42046. (04-12236) 04-12236
07/06/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Nos. 42011/42046.
08/27/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. These are consolidated appeals from a judgment of conviction pursuant to a jury verdict. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." fn10[When reviewing this appeal, this court relied on the trial transcripts filed in Docket No. 42067, a direct appeal brought by one of appellant's co-defendants.] SNP04D-RR/WM/MD. Nos. 42011/42046. 04-15629
09/22/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-16251
09/22/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/06/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 24, 2004. 04-16251