judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RHYMES (MICHAEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42010
Short Caption:RHYMES (MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 47392
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C181522Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/02/2005How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/09/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/09/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-15099
10/30/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-18198
11/25/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date appellant has failed to file either a transcript request form or a certificate indicating that no transcripts are being requested. Appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, file the appropriate document pursuant to NRAP 9. 03-19644
12/01/2003TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 01/31/03, 03/24/03, 03/25/03 (2), 03/26/03 (2). Court Reporter: Liz Garcia. 03-19970
12/05/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Compliance. re: request for transcripts. 03-20245
12/12/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. --Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Compliance. 03-20760
02/12/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to file Opening Brief. Appellant shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions against counsel for appellant. 04-02760
02/27/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 04-03722
03/04/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed February 27, 2004. Appellant shall have until March 18, 2004, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Counsel's caseload will not be deemed such a circumstance. 04-04059
03/18/2004BriefFiled Opening Brief. 04-05115
03/18/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. 04-05116
03/22/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. to Opening Brief and Appendix. Attached to inside back cover of original and copies of brief. 04-05364
04/20/2004BriefFiled Answering Brief. 04-07205
06/02/2004Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
02/02/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. See NRAP 34(f)(1). 05-02152
02/02/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP05-RR/MG/JH
03/24/2005Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Rose, Gibbons and Hardesty, JJ. Author: Per Curiam. Majority: Rose, Gibbons and Hardesty, JJ. 121 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 4. SNP05 05-05721
04/19/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-06132
04/19/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/19/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to the Publishers from Cay Jordan, Editor. Correction on the original opinion, page 3, paragraph 2, line 4: changed "The Stated averred" to "The State averred."
05/05/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 21, 2005. 05-06132