judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAMS (DORELI) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42020
Short Caption:WILLIAMS (DORELI) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C188048Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/10/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/10/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 03-15195
09/10/2003Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: February 4,2003 through February 6, 2003. Court Reporter: Shirlee Prawalsky. Filed in district court on: September 5, 2003. 03-15197
09/15/2003TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 2/4/03, 2/5/03, 2/6/03. Court Reporter: Shirlee Prawalsky. 03-15413
10/20/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 03-17421
11/13/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On October 20, 2003, counsel for appellant filed a motion for an extension of time to file the fast track statement. Counsel informs this court that he is unable to prepare the fast track statement in a timely fashion because of his workload. The motion is denied. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 15 days of this order or show cause why he should not be sanctioned. 03-18895
01/09/2004Order/CounselFiled Order/Sanctions. We conclude that the imposition of a monetary sanction is appropriate. Accordingly, Thomas A. Ericsson shall personally pay the sum of $500 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide the clerk of this court with an affidavit or certificate verifying that payment has been made to the Supreme Court Law Library with 20 days of the date of this order. Further, Ericsson shall file and serve the fast track statement within 10 days of this order or show cause why Ericsson should not be sanctioned further. 04-00610
01/23/2004MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 19-Page Fast Track Statement. 04-01449
01/28/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed January 23, 2004. The clerk of this court shall file the 19-page fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on January 23, 2004. 04-01817
01/28/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 04-01450
01/28/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 04-01451
02/02/2004MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Reconsider Order Imposing Sanctions. 04-02063
02/11/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 04-02639
03/08/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On February 2, 2004, Thomas Ericsson filed a motion to reconsider the order imposing sanctions. The motion is denied. Ericsson shall personally pay the previously-imposed sanction of $500 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide the clerk of this court with an affidavit or certificate verifying that payment has been made to the Supreme Court Law Library within 20 days of the date of this order. 04-04317
03/29/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. Proof of payment of sanction in the amount of $500 - check no. 3142 payable to the Supreme Court Law Library by Thomas A. Ericsson 04-05842
04/26/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Affirmance and Limited Remand to Correct the Judgment of Conviction. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED and REMAND this matter to the district court for the limited purpose of correcting the judgment of conviction." NNP04-NB/DA/MG 04-07590
05/21/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-07683
05/21/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/16/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 24, 2004. 04-07683