judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FRENCH (WILLIAM) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42021
Short Caption:FRENCH (WILLIAM) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38249 , 55758 , 58095 , 62812
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C173224Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Douglas, GibbonsCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Senior Justice Shearing for Justice DouglasPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/06/2004How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/10/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/10/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 03-15201
09/15/2003OtherDisqualification of Justice Gibbons.
09/15/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Judgment/Order Appealed from and Notice of Entry of Order filed on 9/9/03. Due Date: 10 days
09/22/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Order Denying Defendant's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Post-Conviction) filed in district court on September 9, 2003. 03-15799
09/22/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: September 9, 2003. 03-15800
10/22/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 120 days. See NRAP 11(a)(2) (each complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.) fn1[The record shall not include any physical, non-documentary exhibits or the original documentary exhibits filed in the district court, but copies of documentary exhibits submitted in the district court proceedings shall be transmitted as part of the record on appeal. The record shall also include any presentence investigation reports submitted in this matter. The clerk of the district court shall transmit the reports to this court in a sealed envelope identifying the contents and marked confidential.] Nos. 41974/42021/42026/42029/42071 - cases are not consolidated. 03-17555
02/06/2004Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 3. 04-02377
02/06/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/19/2004OtherDisqualification of Justice Douglas. Sat in district court proceedings.
04/29/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that French is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP04S-MS/RR/WM 04-07854
06/02/2004Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). Fn1[We have reviewed all documents that French has submitted in proper person to this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submission is warranted. To the extent that French has attempted to present claims or facts in those documents which were not previously presented in the proceedings below, we have declined to consider them in the first instance.] 04-10160
06/29/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-10378
06/29/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/04/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 1, 2004. 04-10378