judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DONALD J. McDONALD v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-95)
Case Number:06-95Case Docketed On:05/01/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:DONALD J. McDONALD v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DONALD J. McDONALD, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDonald J. McDonald Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/01/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/01/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/01/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/22/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/23/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/25/2006Notice-Incoming - Other, duplicate copies of order to proceed in forma pauperis, motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and criminal transcript noticeNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
08/11/2006Order - Dismiss - want of prosecutionOrderDismiss - want of prosecutionFinal
08/28/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal