judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERT C. YOUNG V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1001
Short Caption:ROBERT C. YOUNG V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Sexual Abuse
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-20533-09Filed Date:08/10/2010

Opening Event Date:08/10/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/26/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/19/2012
Argued/Submitted:09/25/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/26/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRobert C. Young Y
James W. KleinNY
Jessica Brand YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Nicholas P. ColemanYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/10/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/30/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
09/10/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ORDERED/NEEDED (PII)
10/21/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (16 pgs/Ott) 4/20/10 proc.
10/21/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (50 pgs/Hunt) 4/23/10 proc.
10/21/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (172 pgs/Hunt) 5/10/10 proc.
10/21/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (182 pgs/Gilliam) 5/11/10 proc.
10/21/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (105 pgs/Wood) 5/12/10 proc.
10/21/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (153 pgs/Ott) 5/13/10 proc.
10/21/2010FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (481 pgs/Davis) 5/17-19/10 proc.
10/21/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (17 pgs/Burr) 7/20/10 proc.
10/21/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (17 pgs/Burr) 7/27/10 proc. cd attached
10/26/2010RECORD INDEX
10/26/2010RECORD COPIES
10/26/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (order sealing bench conference---Judge Dixon-filed 4/20/10--SEALED)
10/26/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/29/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/08/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. no oppo
12/15/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before March 8, 2011. (JAC)
03/08/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo 90 days
03/17/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 6, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC)
06/06/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. no oppo
06/14/2011 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motionf or an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before September 6, 2011. No further re quests for extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of good cause.(ETW)
09/06/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File - for 90 days for Brief and Appendix(no oppo) (Appellant)
09/14/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix.
11/04/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
11/04/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
11/08/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
11/16/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for an extension of time within whihc to file the brief to 1/5/12.
01/05/2012FiledMotion To File Excess-Paged Brief (Appellee)
01/09/2012FiledTMC//MOTION TO FILE LODGED BRIEF IN EXCESS PAGES
01/19/2012FiledOrder Granting motion for leave to file excess brief. (GLTHFA)
01/19/2012FiledBriefing Completed
01/19/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
02/10/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
04/05/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
04/11/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
04/20/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
07/11/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
07/12/2012FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellee)
07/26/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/11/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
09/18/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
09/18/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief.
09/19/2012FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellee)
09/25/2012FiledArgued Before Glickman,Blackburne-Rigsby,Oberly Jessica Brand Esq.,for appellant, Nicholas P. Coleman Esq.,for appellee
04/04/2013FiledReversed And Remanded (OPINION) (Glickman, Blackburne-Rigsby, and Oberly, Associate Judges.)
04/26/2013FiledMandate