judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MEEGAN VS. MEEGAN

Case Information: 42002
Short Caption:MEEGAN VS. MEEGANCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 40990
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D289282Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/08/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/08/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 03-14998
09/22/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We conclude that we lack jurisdiction to consider this appeal, and " . . . we dismiss it." NNP04S-NB/MS/MG 03-15777
10/24/2003Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. On October 6, 2003, this court received appellant's petition for rehearing. fn2[We direct the clerk of this court to file the rehearing petition.] The documents before us demonstrate that petitioner filed a motion to dismiss the divorce complaint and that his motion was granted. He is therefore not aggrieved by the district court's order and cannot appeal. As petitioner has not demonstrated that rehearing is warranted, " . . . we deny rehearing." fn4[NRAP 40.] NNP04S-NB/MS/MG 03-17777
10/24/2003Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. 03-16601
11/18/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-18090
11/18/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/04/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 20, 2003. 03-18090