judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GERALD M. MCKINNON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 91-CF-0792
Short Caption:GERALD M. MCKINNON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Lead:91-CF-0792Consolidated: 92-CO-0883
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10116-90Filed Date:07/10/1991

Opening Event Date:07/10/1991Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/24/1992Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/19/1993
Argued/Submitted:10/07/1993
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/02/1994

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGerald M. Mckinnon N
William S. Rhyne YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Jennifer M. Anderson NN
John R. Fisher NN
Miriam M. Smolen YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MCKINON, GERALD M. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902SCRND/ RE STATUS OF 23-110 MO
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 1/17/92 ORD: GRT APLE MO X TM NOTE - 01 TO FL LODGED BRF. F/O THIS NOTE - 02 APPEAL SHALL BE SCHED FOR NOTE - 02 CONSID. BEF A MERITS DIV. AS NOTE - 03 SOON AS THE CALENDAR PERMITS. NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 3/9/92 ORD: CASE IS HEREBY NOTE - 04 STAYED PENDING FURTHER ORDER NOTE - 05 OF THIS CRT; CNSL FR APLT TO NOTE - 05 ADVISE THIS CRT IN 30 RE NOTE - 06 STATUS OF PENDING MO FL IN NOTE - 06 TRL CRT PURSUANT TO D.C. CODE NOTE - 07 23-110. NOTE - 07
07/10/1991NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/26/1991APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MICHAEL P. COLUCCI, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/02/1991APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PMB PANEL SCDATE 080591 SCHPRD DSA
08/13/1991LETTER FROM APLT INQUIRING ABOUT NEW COUNSEL TO HANDLE APPEAL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/28/1991RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 090991 SCHPRD R
09/03/1991LETTER TO APLT ADVISING HIM THAT MICHAEL COLUCCI HAS BEEN APPTD FOR HIM ON APPEAL. DAS PANELJAC SCDATE 081691 SCHPRD Q
09/30/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (176-PGS/PIRFO/5/14/91) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/22/1991ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE WIN 40 DYS FR DTD OF ORD & BRF OF APLE W/IN 30 DYS THEREAFTER. NFX JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 101691 SCHPRD B
11/21/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (ORDER OF JUDGE RICHTER DATED 11/13/91) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/27/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 120291 SCHPRD BA
12/10/1991RECEIVED OF APLT FOR PREPARTATION OF TRANSCRIPT FOR APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/27/1991APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 14 DAYS PMB PANEL SCDATE 010292 SCHPRD BE
01/10/1992RECEIVED APLE' BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/14/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (8-PGS/PIRFO/5/14/91) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1992APPELEE'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1992ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 3. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 011492 SCHPRD B
01/17/1992BRIEFS COMPLETED
02/10/1992APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY APPEAL PENDING OUTCOME OF APLT D.C. CODE SEC. 23-110 MOTION PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL) (ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE RICHTER ON 2/20/92) PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (ORD BY J. RICHTER DTD 2/21/92) PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1992ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04-07. EVH PANELRO SCDATE 022692 SCHPRD V
04/08/1992STATEMENT of appellant regarding the status of pending 23-110 motion in trial court.
05/15/1992Counsel for appellant shall advise this court wit hin 30 days from the date of this order as to the status of the pending motion filed in the trial court pursuant to D.C. Code 23-110. (JAC)
06/15/1992STATEMENT of aplt re 23-110 motion
06/19/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (order/ june 15, 1992 judge robert i. richter)
07/21/1992ORDER: Counsel for appellant shall advise this co urt within 30 days from the date of this order as to the status of the pending motion filed in the trial court pursuant to D.C. Code Sec. 23-110. (JEP)
08/04/1992ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEAL nos. 91-cf-792 and 92-co-883 for all purposes herein. F/O that Michael P. Colucci, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant herein. F/O that appellant shall file the docketing statement in appeal no. 92-co-883 within 10 days from the date of this order. (JWR)
08/14/1992APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT
08/24/1992RECORD COMPLETED
08/24/1992RECORD ON APPEAL
10/28/1992ORDER: The brief of appellant in no. 92-CO-883 shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order and the brief of appellee in no. 92-CO-883 shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. Any request for an extension of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only in extraordinary circumstances. (WHG)
11/05/1992COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS and for appointment of new counsel Granted
11/17/1992APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY the briefing schedule pending appointment of new counsel
12/15/1992ORDER: Grant the motion of counsel for appellant to withdraw and the appointment of Michael P. Colucci,Esquire, is vacated, and William S. Rhyne, Esquire, is appointed to represent appellant herein. Michael P. Colucci, Esquire, shall transmit all documents pertaining to this appeal to mewly-appointed counsel forthwith. F/O that newly-appointed counsel for appellant shall advise this court within 20 days from the date of this order as to whether he wishes to file a supplemental brief on behalf of appellant. (BY JWR)
12/15/1992ORDER DENYING APPELLANT MOTION FOR STAY as moot. (BY JWR)
12/15/1992APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) William S. Rhyne, Esq.
12/29/1992STATEMENT reporting respecting further briefing.
01/25/1993ORDER: Counsel for appellant shall file said supplemental brief in appeal no. 91-cf-792 with this court forthwith. F/O that the brief of appellant in appeal no. 92-co-883 shall be filed with this court within 40 days from the date of this order. (BY WHN)
03/08/1993APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM
03/08/1993APPELLANT'S BRIEF
04/12/1993APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 8 days
04/20/1993RECEIVED - aple's brief
05/19/1993ORD GRANT APLE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEFand the lodged brief is filed; and the case shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division of this court as soon as the calendar permits. (WHG)
05/19/1993APPELLEE'S BRIEF
05/19/1993BRIEFS COMPLETED
06/11/1993FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
10/07/1993FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/07/1993ARGUED (FE,SC,BE) William S. Rhyne, Esquire, for appellant. Miriam M. Smolen, Esquire, for appellee.
07/07/1994AFFIRMED Opinion
07/07/1994APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) William S. Rhyne, Esq. (Petition for Writ of Certiorari)
08/02/1994MANDATE ISSUED
10/13/1994NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI Supreme Court No. 94-6353
11/16/1994NOTICE OF DENIAL OF PET. FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI 11/14/94 denied
11/23/1994COPY OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI