judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CROWN COMMERCIAL VS. SAHARA MEADOWS

Case Information: 45941
Short Caption:CROWN COMMERCIAL VS. SAHARA MEADOWSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A492349Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/07/2005 / Haberfeld, StephenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/19/2006How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/15/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from John Peter Lee--check no. 33966.
09/15/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-18423
10/03/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 05-19538
10/07/2005Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge:Stephen E. Haberfeld . (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/11/2005Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 05-20033
11/21/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 05-22924
12/05/2005Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. 05-23701
12/19/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 05/09/05, 06/17/05, 08/01/05, and 09/19/05. To Court Reporter: Kim Tuchman. 05-24637
12/27/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 05/09/05, 06/17/05, 08/01/05, and 09/19/05. Court Reporter: Kim Tuchman. 05-25197
03/07/2006BriefFiled Opening Brief. 06-04993
03/07/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 through 3. 06-04994
04/07/2006BriefFiled Answering Brief. 06-07361
04/20/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Errata. Errataum to Respondent's Answering Brief. 06-08395
05/03/2006MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: June 7, 2006. 06-09239
06/08/2006BriefFiled Reply Brief. 06-12019
07/19/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. 06-15015
07/19/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/08/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the district court's order." fn8[As appellant has not asserted that the award of attorney fees and costs was, independent of the summary judgment, improper, we affirm that portion of the order as well.] CA06-RR/MG/JH 06-16451
09/05/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-16825
09/05/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/15/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 7, 2006. 06-16825