Case Information: 91-CF-0745 | |||
Short Caption: | KEITH P. HOPKINS V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony |
Lead: | 89-CF-0827 | Consolidated: | 91-CF-0745 |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F1750-88 | Filed Date: | 06/26/1991 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 06/26/1991 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 08/29/1991 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 11/29/1991 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 04/01/1992 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 04/24/1992 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Keith P. Hopkins | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | HOPKINS, KEITH P. UNITED STATES | |||
01/01/1902 | ||||
06/26/1991 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
07/16/1991 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PAUL J. RILEY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
07/16/1991 | ORDER CONS. W/89-827. DSA DUE IN 10. PAUL J. RILEY APPT.TO REP APLT AD PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
07/23/1991 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PMB PANEL SCDATE 072691 SCHPRD DSA | |||
08/19/1991 | RECORD ON APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 082691 SCHPRD R | |||
08/29/1991 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
09/19/1991 | ORDER APLT BRF DUE W/IN 40 DYS FRM DT OF ORD. APLE BRF DUE W/IN 30 DYS THEREAFTER. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 082691 SCHPRD GR | |||
10/09/1991 | ORDER APLT TO FL BRF IN 10 OR VACATED APPT. OF CJA COUNSEL. AD PANELRBH SCDATE 100791 SCHPRD K | |||
10/11/1991 | ORDER CT'S ORD OF 10/9/91 IS VACATE. BRF OF APLT REMAINS DUE 10/29/ 91. AD PANELRO SCDATE 102191 SCHPRD BA | |||
10/29/1991 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 102991 SCHPRD BA | |||
11/29/1991 | APPELEE'S BRIEF PR PANEL SCDATE 120391 SCHPRD BE | |||
11/29/1991 | BRIEFS COMPLETED | |||
12/20/1991 | RECEIVED REPLY BRIEF OF APLT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/01/1992 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
04/01/1992 | SUBMITTED to JJ Rg St Sc | |||
04/02/1992 | AFFIRMED moj af judgment on appeal (rg st sc) | |||
04/24/1992 | MANDATE ISSUED |