judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LEYVA (RONNY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45940
Short Caption:LEYVA (RONNY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C203354Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/15/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/15/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. 05-18414
10/20/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP06R-MD/RR/RP 05-20781
11/15/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-21708
11/15/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 22, 2005. 05-21708