Case Information: 91-CF-0744 | |||
Short Caption: | DERRICK C. FREEMAN V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F6467-90 | Filed Date: | 07/02/1991 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 07/02/1991 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 08/23/1991 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 03/27/1992 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 09/02/1992 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 09/24/1992 |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Derrick C. Freeman | N |
| |||||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | FREEMAN, DERRICK C. UNITED STATES | |||
01/01/1902 | 2/28/92 MLBA | |||
07/02/1991 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
07/25/1991 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MARIAN FLYNN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
08/02/1991 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PMB PANEL SCDATE 080591 SCHPRD DSA | |||
08/23/1991 | RECORD ON APPEAL PMB PANEL SCDATE 090391 SCHPRD R | |||
08/23/1991 | RECORD ON APPEAL | |||
08/23/1991 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
09/20/1991 | ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS; BRF OF APLE DUE 30 DAYS THERE- AFTER. EVH PANELRBH SCDATE 091291 SCHPRD V | |||
09/24/1991 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF RT PMB PANEL SCDATE 103191 SCHPRD BA | |||
10/11/1991 | ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM & BRF SHALL BE FL 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETE REC IS FL. DAS PANELJAC SCDATE 100791 SCHPRD OPE | |||
12/03/1991 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (167 PGS. & 11 PGS. -- MOLLICHELLI) (4/15-16/91 PROCEEDINGS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 112691 SCHPRD RT | |||
12/12/1991 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (75 PGS. - HUNT) (4/12/91 PROC.) PR PANEL SCDATE 112591 SCHPRD RT | |||
01/17/1992 | ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE 40 DAYS FR DTD OF ORD & BRF OF APLE DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFTER. NFX. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 010692 SCHPRD B | |||
02/27/1992 | RECEIVED BRIEF OF APPELLANT (WAITING FOR MLBA, BA IS ONE DAY LATE.) PR PANEL SCDATE 022692 SCHPRD BA | |||
02/28/1992 | APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF PR PANEL SCDATE 030992 SCHPRD CHECK | |||
03/12/1992 | ORD GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEFand the lodged brief of appellant is filed. F/O that the brief of appellee shall be filed with this court on or before April 16, 1992, (By JAC) | |||
03/27/1992 | APPELLEE'S BRIEF | |||
03/27/1992 | BRIEFS COMPLETED | |||
04/10/1992 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (exhibits only) | |||
09/02/1992 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
09/02/1992 | SUMMARY I CALENDAR | |||
09/02/1992 | SUBMITTED WG KG MK | |||
09/02/1992 | AFFIRMED MOJ AF judgment on appeal (WG KG MK) | |||
09/24/1992 | MANDATE ISSUED |