judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

INT'L FIDELITY INS. CO. VS. STATE

Case Information: 42028
Short Caption:INT'L FIDELITY INS. CO. VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C173662Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/18/2003 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/12/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Wadhams & Akridge P.C.--check no. 23285.
09/12/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-15282
09/18/2003Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/29/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-16210
09/30/2003Notice/Outgoing Letter. Lester H. Berkson. (docketing statement)
12/01/2003Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued for 30-60 days for further negotiations. 03-19931
04/07/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued for 30-60 days for status report from attorneys. 04-06404
07/21/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued for further discussions. 04-13267
08/23/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 04-15225
08/31/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 04-15788
09/23/2004MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 04-17655
10/04/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 04-18250
10/04/2004Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.