judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

AMERICON COMPANIES VS. AHLERS

Case Information: 42027
Short Caption:AMERICON COMPANIES VS. AHLERSCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 41917 , 42637
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A417547Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:DouglasCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:05/20/2004 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/11/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/11/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-15256
09/11/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
09/17/2003Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/29/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Shirley B. Parraguirre--check no. 29741.
11/25/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to file Docketing Statement. Appellants shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement. 03-19647
12/08/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-20357
12/10/2003Notice/Outgoing Letter. Stephen E. Haberfeld. (docketing statement)
12/15/2003Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. Settlement Judge respectfully recommends to recuse himself from Case No. 42027, but remain as Settlement Judge in Case No. 41917. Nos. 41917/42027. 03-20846
12/26/2003MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 03-21452
01/05/2004MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 04-00232
05/20/2004Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. New Settlement Judge: Janet Trost.
06/01/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Respondent has filed a "Motion to Dismiss Appeal," requesting this court to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction. Appellants have filed a an opposition to the motion. We deny respondent's motion. This denial is without prejudice to respondent's right to renew the motion, if necessary, upon completion of settlement proceedings. 04-09966
06/23/2004OtherDisqualification of Justice Douglas. Sat in district court proceedings.
08/09/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 04-14487
08/09/2004Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 04-14488
09/08/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 04-16440
09/08/2004Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.