judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MENO (ANTHONY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45938
Short Caption:MENO (ANTHONY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C187371Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:GibbonsCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/26/2006How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/15/2005OtherDisqualification of Justice Gibbons.
09/15/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/15/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 05-18408
12/01/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. appellant's counsel Christopher R. Oram shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of the date of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 05-23547
12/14/2005MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Clarification or Motion Extension of Extension of Time to File Fast Track Statement. 05-24354
12/16/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Judgment filed on or about 10/20/05. Due Date: 10 days
01/04/2006Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Clark County Clerk. There have been no documents filed in this case since 10/20/05. 06-00179
01/13/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. On December 14, 2005, attorney Christopher Oram filed a motion for clarification and informed this court he was not counsel for this matter. Because appellant was acting the district court in proper person, this appeal is not subject to the provisions of NRAP 3C. Orma is relieved of any further obligation with respect to this appeal, and this appeal shall proceed as a proper person appeal. Record due: 30 days. 06-00959
01/26/2006Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 3. 06-01906
01/26/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/21/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Entry Written Judgment or Order. District court judgment or order due: 30 days. 06-03725
03/22/2006Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on March 17, 2006. 06-06079
04/21/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP06-RR/MD/RP 06-08441
05/17/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-08802
05/17/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/05/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 22, 2006. 06-08802