Case Information: 91-CF-0733 | |||
Short Caption: | PEDRO E. REDMAN V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F7478-90 | Filed Date: | 06/25/1991 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 06/25/1991 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 11/06/1991 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 06/22/1992 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 10/28/1992 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 12/08/1992 |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Pedro Redman | N |
| |||||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | REDMAN, PEDRO E. UNITED STATES | |||
01/01/1902 | ||||
06/25/1991 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
07/25/1991 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MARVIN B. BARTLETT, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
08/07/1991 | APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS PMB PANEL SCDATE 080591 SCHPRD DSA | |||
08/07/1991 | RECEIVED DOCKETING STATEMENT PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
08/16/1991 | RECORD ON APPEAL PR PANEL SCDATE 092591 SCHPRD R | |||
08/27/1991 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
08/27/1991 | ORDER GRNTD APLT'S MO FOR LV TO FILE DOCKETING STATE, THE LODGED DSA IS HEREBY FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 082691 SCHPRD CHECK | |||
09/17/1991 | MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF CRT RPTR FRANKLIN FOR EXT. OF TM TO FL 5/28/91 PROC. TO 10/22/91. PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
09/18/1991 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (131 PGS. -- HUNT) (5/29/91 PROC.) PR PANEL SCDATE 092891 SCHPRD RT | |||
09/24/1991 | ORDER DENY CT RPTR FRANKLIN'S MOTION AS UNTIMELY FILED. PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/23/1991 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (83-PGS/FRANKLIN 5/28/91) AJ PANEL SCDATE 082791 SCHPRD RT | |||
11/06/1991 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (41 PGS. -- FRANKLIN) (5/28/91) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/06/1991 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
02/10/1992 | ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 & BRF OF APLE DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFTER. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 020492 SCHPRD GR | |||
04/07/1992 | counsel for appellant shall file the brief within 10 days from the date of this order. Failure to do so may result in his appointment being vacated and his name being removed from the panel of attorneys authorized to receive appointments under the Criminal Justice Act. (By J. Rogers) | |||
04/30/1992 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for a 10 day extension (no oppo). | |||
05/05/1992 | ORD GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEFto May 11, 1992. | |||
05/22/1992 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF | |||
05/27/1992 | counsel for appellant shall file the brief within 10 days from the date of this order. Failure to do so may result in his appointment being vacated and his name being removed from the panel of attorneys authorized to receive appointments under the Criminal Justice Act. (By J. Rogers) | |||
06/22/1992 | APPELLEE'S BRIEF | |||
06/22/1992 | BRIEFS COMPLETED | |||
08/04/1992 | FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I | |||
10/23/1992 | APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE AMENDED/CORRECTED BRIEF | |||
10/26/1992 | APPELLEE'S REPLY to appellants motion to amend his brief. | |||
10/26/1992 | APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY to appellant's motion for leave to amend his brief. | |||
10/28/1992 | ORDER grant appellant's motion for leave to amend appellant's brief. (SCFASU) | |||
10/28/1992 | SUBMITTED SC FASU | |||
11/10/1992 | AFFIRMED IN PART/REMANDED IN PART Judgment RM case to trial court for resentencing & in all other respects affirming judgment of conviction SC FA SU | |||
12/08/1992 | MANDATE ISSUED |