judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HUNTER VS. WATERTON DESERT SHORES

Case Information: 45937
Short Caption:HUNTER VS. WATERTON DESERT SHORESCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A4944452Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/07/2005 / Nitz, DanaSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/15/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/15/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-18409
09/15/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
09/15/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
09/19/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Palmer & Associates check no. 1683.
10/07/2005Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Dana Jonathon Nitz. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/01/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to file Case Appeal Statement and Docketing Statement. Case appeal statement and docketing statement due: 10 days. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions, including dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 05-21502
11/02/2005MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Respondents Waterton Desert Shores, LLC and JMB Realty Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 05-21636
11/17/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction. This denial is without prejudice to respondents' right to renew the motion upon completion of settlement proceedings. 05-22713
01/03/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 06-00094
01/12/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 06-00916
01/27/2006Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 06-02098
02/13/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 06-03071
02/13/2006Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.