judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: ESTATE OF LANE

Case Information: 42006
Short Caption:IN RE: ESTATE OF LANECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - PR0200838Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/29/2003How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/09/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Lori Ramos (cash).
09/09/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 03-15087
09/12/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due in District Court Case No. PR0200838: 120 days. fn2[See NRAP 11(a)(2) (providing that the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.)] The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. 03-15281
10/29/2003Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 03-18061
10/29/2003Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/29/2003Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Patricia F. Winnie offering to answer questions or provide comments in this case as this matter will not be briefed. 03-18062
05/06/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP04-NB/DA/MG 04-08323
06/02/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-08460
06/02/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/16/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 4, 2004. 04-08460