judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BEARD-QUIMBY VS. BEARD

Case Information: 42004
Short Caption:BEARD-QUIMBY VS. BEARDCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37342 , 37688 , 38627 , 38628 , 38895 , 40844 , 41741 , 44979 , 45840
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D253090Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/23/2004How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/08/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/08/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 03-15061
09/23/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Clark County Clerk regarding Transmission of Order and Notice of Entry of Order, due 10 days.
10/06/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order/judgment of conviction filed in district court on February 20, 2003. 03-16633
10/06/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: February 20, 2003. 03-16634
10/24/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due in District Court Case No. D253090: 120 days. fn2[See NRAP 11(a)(2) (providing that the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.)] The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. 03-17771
02/23/2004Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols.1 through 8. 04-03405
02/23/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/15/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. In both appeals docketed in this court, appellant seeks to appeal from the same district court ordered entered on remand in February 2002. This court lacks jurisdiction to consider the appeals from that order. In either instance, appellant's attempt s to appeal from the February 2002 were untimely. "We dismiss the appeal in Docket No. 42004." We dismiss the portion of the appeal in Docket No. 41741 that purports to challenge the February order. As for the appeal from the June 13, 2003 order finding appellant in contempt, this court lacks jurisdiction over an appeal from a contempt order. This court lacks jurisdiction to consider appellant's appeal from the June 13 order, and we dismiss the appeal in Docket No. 41741. fn5[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, see NRAP 46(b), we have considered appellant's proper person documents, and we conclude that the relief requested therein is moot in light of this order.] SNP04D-RR/WM/MD. Nos. 41741/42004 - cases are not consolidated. 04-19146
11/09/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-19643
11/09/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/01/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 12, 2004. 04-19643