judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-7563
B-7563
04/27/1978
Application for Writ of Error
LONNIE DALE EDMONDS
CHARLES BALDWIN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/26/1978Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/13/1978Amended PetitionPetitioner
05/08/1978Errata FiledRespondent
05/05/1978Response to PetitionRespondent
04/27/1978Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/26/1978Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/13/1978Amended Petition
07/13/1978Miscellaneous Motion
06/26/1978Letter Filed
05/08/1978Errata Filed
05/05/1978Response to Petition
04/27/1978Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/27/1978Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Charles BaldwinRespondent
Lonnie Dale EdmondsPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information