Case Information: 91-CF-0776 | |||
Short Caption: | JOHN MOYE III V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F11795-90 | Filed Date: | 07/09/1991 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 07/09/1991 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 09/06/1991 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 12/04/1991 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 03/12/1992 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 04/24/1992 |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | John Moye | N |
| |||||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | MOYE III, JOHN UNITED STATES | |||
01/01/1902 | **TO BE ARGUED** | |||
01/01/1903 | NOTE - 01 CODEF: GARY S. SMITH NOTE - 01 | |||
07/09/1991 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
07/26/1991 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PHILIP C. BATEN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
08/09/1991 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PMB PANEL SCDATE 080591 SCHPRD DSA | |||
09/06/1991 | RECORD ON APPEAL PMB PANEL SCDATE 090991 SCHPRD R | |||
09/06/1991 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
09/23/1991 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (191 PGS. -- BURNEY) (3/20/91 - 3/22/91 PROC.) PR PANEL SCDATE 091491 SCHPRD RT | |||
09/30/1991 | ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE 40 DAYS FR DTD OF ORDER & BRF OF APLE DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFTER. NFX. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 092591 SCHPRD B | |||
11/04/1991 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 111291 SCHPRD BA | |||
12/04/1991 | APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 121291 SCHPRD BE | |||
12/04/1991 | BRIEFS COMPLETED | |||
02/07/1992 | APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/11/1992 | LETTER GRANT APPELLANT'S REQUEST TO ARGUE KHO PANELJAC SCDATE 021192 SCHPRD LTR | |||
03/12/1992 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
03/12/1992 | ARGUED before JJ SC KG GA Argument by Philip Clarke Baten, Esq., counsel for appellant; and by Jennifer M. Anderson, Esq., counsel for appellee. | |||
04/01/1992 | AFFIRMED moj af judgment on appeal (sc kg ga) | |||
04/24/1992 | MANDATE ISSUED |