Case Information: 45943 | |||
Short Caption: | JACKSON, JR. (RALPH) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 35924 , 39208 , 39847 , 52792 , 69669 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C146967 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 11/07/2005 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/15/2005 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
09/15/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 05-18421 | |
09/30/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. | 05-19507 | |
11/07/2005 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 6. | 05-21938 | |
11/07/2005 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
12/21/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP06-WM/MG/JH | 05-24860 | |
01/05/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Request. On December 16, 2005, this court received a proper person request for leave to file an opening brief. This court denies the request as moot. | 06-00285 | |
01/17/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-00508 | |
01/17/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/25/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 19, 2006. | 06-00508 |