judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MANNING (MICHAEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45942
Short Caption:MANNING (MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 46575 , 46852 , 48203 , 49963 , 50378 , 50995
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C194534Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/15/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/15/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 05-18417
09/16/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Judgment/Order Appealed from filed on 9/8/05. Due Date: 10 days
09/22/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of amended judgment of conviction filed in district court on September 8, 2005. 05-18853
10/17/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP06R-MD/RR/RP 05-20402
11/15/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-20707
11/15/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 22, 2005. 05-20707