judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PRESS VS. YANKE

Case Information: 45934
Short Caption:PRESS VS. YANKECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A464470Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/04/2005 / Saint-Aubin, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/15/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/15/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-18402
09/15/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
10/04/2005Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert F. Saint-Aubin . (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/12/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to pay Filing Fee and to file Docketing Statement. Submit filing fee and docketing statement: 10 days. Failure to comply timely may result in the imposition of sanctions, including dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 05-20237
10/27/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Yaron & Associates, check no. 6555.
10/27/2005Other Returned Unfiled Document.
11/18/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 05-22841
12/01/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss this appeal or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 05-23544
02/06/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "We dismiss this appeal as abandoned." NNP06-MD/NB/RP 06-02649
03/03/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-03420
03/03/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/17/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 6, 2006. 06-03420