judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DOLBOW (DAVID) VS. CITY OF LAS VEGAS

Case Information: 42007
Short Caption:DOLBOW (DAVID) VS. CITY OF LAS VEGASCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 42138
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C190534Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/09/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/09/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 03-15092
09/09/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
09/15/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Copy filed in district court on September 5, 2003. 03-15386
09/15/2003Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 8/1/03. Court Reporter: Shirlee Prawalsky. Filed in district court on: September 5, 2003. 03-15389
09/17/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due from counsel for appellant: 20 days from the date of this order. The deadlines for the filing of documents pursuant to NRAP 3C are hereby suspended pending further order of this court. 03-15505
10/07/2003MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 03-16656
10/20/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP04-RR/ML/WM 03-17391
11/14/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-17571
11/14/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/04/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 19, 2003. 03-17571