judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAM I. BASS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 91-CF-0813
Short Caption:WILLIAM I. BASS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead:91-CF-0813Consolidated: 93-CO-1560
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F9655-90Filed Date:07/15/1991

Opening Event Date:07/15/1991Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/30/1991Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/06/1994
Argued/Submitted:10/27/1994
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/28/1994

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWilliam I. Bass N
Brian C. Plitt YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Mary B. Murphy YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BASS, WILLIAM I. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902TO MXBE FILED 3/6/92
07/15/1991NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/30/1991APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BRIAN C. PLITT, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/09/1991APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 080991 SCHPRD DSA
09/04/1991RECORD ON APPEAL PMB PANEL SCDATE 091691 SCHPRD R
09/04/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (192 PGS/BREMEN) 2/1/91 - PROC. DTE. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/30/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (171 PGS/HUNT) 2/4/91 - PROC. DTE. PMB PANEL SCDATE 091891 SCHPRD RT
09/30/1991RECORD COMPLETED
12/23/1991ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 & BRF OF APLE DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFTER.AC PANELRBH SCDATE 091891 SCHPRD U
02/05/1992RECEIVED APLT BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/11/1992ORDER APLT TO FL BRF W/IN 10 DAYS OR CJA APPT. VACATED. AC PANELRO SCDATE 020692 SCHPRD K
02/14/1992ORDER VACATED 2/11/92 ORDER PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/19/1992APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF PR PANEL SCDATE 021892 SCHPRD MLBA
02/19/1992APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/05/1992APPELLANT'S BRIEF AC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/05/1992ORDER GR MO OF APLT LV FL BRF,LODGED BRF FLD. MO TO STAY DEN W/OUT PREJ TO REWAL. AC PANELRBH SCDATE 030392 SCHPRD TO
03/06/1992APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/16/92 AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1992APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION
04/09/1992ORDER The motion for extension of time to file a copy of the 23-110 motion is granted. The motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief of appellant is denied as moot.
07/21/1992ORDER Appellant shall file a copy of the motion filed in the trial court pursuant to D.C. Code 23-110 within 10 days from hte date of this order. Failure to compy may result in the ussuance of a briefing order.
07/28/1992RECEIVED COURTESY COPY OF MOTION TO VACATE CONVICTION OR REDUCE SENTENCE PURSUANT TO D.C. CODE SEC. 23-110
07/01/1993CASE STAYED
07/01/1993ORDER contrue 7/28/92 copy of trial court motion as a request for stay and stay case pending disposition of 23-110 motion in the trial court; counsel for appellant to advise court in 30 days as to the status of the pending trial court motion. (By RO)
08/03/1993STATEMENT of aplt advise regarding status of pending 23-110 motion
10/14/1993ORDER -ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall advise this court, within 30 days from the date of this order, as to the status of the pending motion filed in the trial court pursuant to D.C. Code 23-110. If the motion in the trial court is denied, review of that denial may be sought only by filing a separate notice of appeal, after which the two appeals will be consolidated. See Hall v. U.S. 559 A.2d 1321, 1322 (D.C. 1989). (By WHN)
11/18/1993STATEMENT of appellant in re to the status of pending 23-110 motion.
12/20/1993PROCEED WITH APPEAL, NO LONGER ON HOLD/STAYED
12/20/1993ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS nos 91-CF_813 and 93-CO-1560 are consolidated for all purposes. F/O that Brian C. Plitt, Esquire, is appointed to represent appellant in no. 93-CO-1560. F/O that appellant shall file the docketing statement within 15 days from the date of this order. (By RO)
01/07/1994RECEIVED- aplt's docketing statement Need extra copies plus a motion to file late
01/07/1994LETTER - see 1/7/94 entry
01/24/1994RECORD ON APPEAL
02/10/1994APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS
03/08/1994ORDER GRANTING APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS and the lodged docketing statement is filed. (by: WHN)
03/08/1994APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT
04/05/1994RECEIVED amended brief of appellant. (Holding for a motion for leave, to file his amended brief).
04/07/1994APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE AMENDED/CORRECTED BRIEF
04/26/1994ORD GRT APLT MO FOR LV TO FL AMENDED/CORRECTED BRFand the lodged amended brief is filed. F/O that the consolidated brief of appellee shall be filed on or before May 6, 1994. (BY WHN)
04/29/1994SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (40 pgs --MOLLICHELLI) (JUNE 16, 1993 proc.)
05/06/1994APPELLEE'S BRIEF
05/06/1994BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/16/1994FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
10/27/1994SUBMITTED (TE,ST,PR)
11/01/1994AFFIRMED MOJ (TE,ST,PR)
11/28/1994MANDATE ISSUED