judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GIARDINA (FRANK) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45921
Short Caption:GIARDINA (FRANK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 43685 , 45922
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C192200Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/21/2005How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/14/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/14/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 05-18261
09/30/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 05-19510
11/03/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 5, 2005. Court Reporter: Joseph D'Amato. 05-21690
11/10/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 17, 2005. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. 05-22233
11/21/2005Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 and 2. 05-22929
11/21/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/16/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn12[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person, and conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] SNP06-WM/MG/JH 06-03444
03/15/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-04311
03/15/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/24/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 17, 2006. 06-04311