judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARKS (HELEN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45920
Short Caption:MARKS (HELEN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 48095 , 49304
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C210356Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/14/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/14/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 05-18251
09/14/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 9/20/05, 6/21/05, 6/23/05 and 8/9/05. Court Reporter: Janie Olsen. Filed in district court on: September 8, 2005. 05-18252
09/30/2005TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 06/20/05; 06/21/05; and 06/22/05. Court Reporter: Janie Olsen. 05-19480
09/30/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 08/09/05 Court Reporter: Janie L. Olsen. 05-19482
10/20/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 05-20839
11/10/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast track statement and appendix due: 10 days. 05-22189
11/23/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Tuesday, June 21, 2005 (Excerpt of Jury Instructions read by the Court). Court Reporter: Janie L. Olsen. 05-23120
11/23/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 05-23152
11/23/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 05-23154
12/09/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 05-24100
04/20/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP06-RR/MD/RP 06-08429
05/16/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-08771
05/16/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/05/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 22, 2006. 06-08771