Case Information: 90-CF-0407 | |||
Short Caption: | LINELL FREEMAN V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F13216-89 | Filed Date: | 04/03/1990 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 04/03/1990 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 08/23/1991 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 08/23/1991 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 11/14/1991 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 01/06/1992 |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Linell Freeman | N |
| |||||||||
Appellant | John Doe | N | ||||||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | FREEMAN, LINELL UNITED STATES | |||
01/01/1903 | NOTE - 01 02/06/91 ORD: GRANTG COUNS MO NOTE - 01 TO W/D AS COUNS FOR APLT & NOTE - 02 APPMNT OF PEARSON E. DUBAR, NOTE - 02 ESQ.,IS VAC, & PETER H. MEYERS NOTE - 03 IS APPNTD TO REPRESENT APLT; NOTE - 03 F/O FORMER COUNS TO TRANSMIT NOTE - 04 ALL DOC TO NEWLY-APPNTD COUNS; NOTE - 04 F/O APLT MO FOR STAY IS GRANTD NOTE - 05 & THIS APPEAL IS HEREBY STAYED NOTE - 05 PENDG F/O OF THIS CRT; F/O NOTE - 06 NEWLY-APPNTD COUNS TO ADVISE NOTE - 06 THIS CRT W/IN 30 DAYS AS TO NOTE - 07 STATUS OF PEND MO FL IN TRL NOTE - 07 CRT PURS TO D.C. CODE #23-110. | |||
01/01/1905 | TRDATE- 91/11/14 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - MEYERSP FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - SNYDERW FOR - APPELLEE | |||
01/01/1906 | DUBARP VACATED 2/6/91 | |||
04/03/1990 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
04/18/1990 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PEARSON E. DUBAR, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/30/1990 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE DS TO 5-28-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 043090 SCHPRD DSA | |||
05/23/1990 | ORDER APLT'S MO X TM TO FILE DOCKTG STATEMENT GRNTD TO 05-28-90. NFX GR PANELDDW SCDATE 051890 SCHPRD Q | |||
05/24/1990 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 052890 SCHPRD DSA | |||
06/01/1990 | RECORD ON APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 060490 SCHPRD R | |||
07/18/1990 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (14 PGS.--RAMOS) PR PANEL SCDATE 081090 SCHPRD RT | |||
07/19/1990 | ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
09/05/1990 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 30 DAYS NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 082890 SCHPRD BA | |||
09/20/1990 | ORDER GRNT APLT MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 10-22-90. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 091490 SCHPRD GR | |||
09/27/1990 | APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY DUE TO PENDING 23-110 MOTION AD PANEL SCDATE 102290 SCHPRD BA | |||
10/30/1990 | ORDER APLT'S MO DENIED W/O PREJ TO ITS RENEWAL TO FL MO IN TRL CT PURS D.C. CODE 23-110. GW PANELRO SCDATE 101790 SCHPRD V | |||
12/07/1990 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 23-110 MOTION IS RULED ON IN SUPERIOR COURT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/13/1990 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (46 PGS. -- BURNEY) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
01/15/1991 | COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF PEARSON DUBAR AS APLT'S COUNSEL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/06/1991 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PETER H. MEYERS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/06/1991 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 7 GW PANELRO SCDATE 122490 SCHPRD TO | |||
03/08/1991 | APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE RE STATUS OF 23-110 MOTION IN TRIAL COURT RJG PANEL SCDATE 030591 SCHPRD ANSA | |||
03/28/1991 | MEMORANDUM OF APLT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
05/07/1991 | ORDER BA DUE 7/19, BE DUE 8/23, RBA DUE 9/11, SCDN FOR NOVEMBER CALENDAR. AD PANELRBH SCDATE 041691 SCHPRD B | |||
07/18/1991 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 071991 SCHPRD BA | |||
08/23/1991 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
08/23/1991 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
08/23/1991 | APPELEE'S BRIEF PR PANEL SCDATE 082391 SCHPRD BE | |||
11/12/1991 | CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28 OF APLE AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/13/1991 | MEMORANDUM TRANMITTING TO DIV MEMO FROM APLE PURSUANT TO CITE (28) K KHO PANEL SCDATE 111391 SCHPRD MEMO | |||
11/14/1991 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
11/14/1991 | ARGUED PANELRGTEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/13/1991 | AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELRGTEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/13/1991 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -RO CITE | |||
12/13/1991 | OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - RO PAGE # - 3936 | |||
01/06/1992 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |