judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WINTERS (ANDRE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45936
Short Caption:WINTERS (ANDRE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C198881Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/15/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/15/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 05-18404
12/01/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Respondent shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of the date of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 05-23546
12/12/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 05-24171
01/06/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast track statement and appendix due: 10 days. 06-00388
01/18/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 06-01210
02/07/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Rough draft transcripts due: 10 days. Appellant shall have 20 days from the filing of the transcripts to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. 06-02686
02/13/2006Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Court Reporter Heather K. Newman. She is not the court reporter in this case. 06-03136
02/23/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 06-04004
03/02/2006TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 5/17/05, 5/26/05. Court Reporter: Gina Shrader. 06-04736
03/02/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Counsel for appellant shall have 5 days to file and serve a corrected rough draft transcript request form and 20 days from the filing of the transcripts to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. 06-04762
03/09/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: May 24, 2005 through May 27, 2005. Court Reporter: Gina Shrader. Filed in district court on: 03/07/06. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. 06-05186
03/29/2006TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 05/26/05. Court Reporter: Gina Shrader. 06-06588
03/29/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 06-06590
03/31/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Counsel for appellant shall have 5 days to ascertain the correct court reporter or recorder for the proceedings of May 24, 2005, and file and serve a corrected rough draft transcript request form. Transcript from May 25, 2005 due: 10 days. Appellant shall have 20 days from the filing of the transcripts to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. 06-06868
04/18/2006TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 05/26/06. Court Reporter: Tessa Heishman. 06-08101
04/26/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Corrected rough draft transcript request form from appellant's counsel Marc Saggesse due: 10 days. 06-08869
04/27/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 06-08935
05/01/2006TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 04/28/06. Court Reporter: Gina M. Shrader. 06-09139
05/08/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. for request for rough draft transcripts. 06-09593
05/08/2006TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: May 24, 2005. Court Reporter: Jean M. Dahlberg. 06-09611
05/11/2006Fast Track BriefReceived Fast Track Statement. 06-09992
05/11/2006AppendixReceived Appendix. Appellant's Fast Track Appendix. 06-09993
05/15/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on May 11, 2006. 06-10142
05/15/2006Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 06-09992
05/15/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 06-09993
06/02/2006Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 06-11581
07/27/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP 06-15558
08/22/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-16627
08/22/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/31/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 24, 2006. 06-16627