judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IATAROLA VS. IATAROLA

Case Information: 45930
Short Caption:IATAROLA VS. IATAROLACourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A499473Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/30/2005 / Reed, NathanielSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/15/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Christopherson Law Offices--check no. 1429.
09/15/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-18357
09/30/2005Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Nathaniel J. Reed . (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/03/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 05-19553
10/03/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Docketing Statement. 05-19606
10/11/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. 05-20008
11/07/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 05-21968
12/01/2005Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 05-23549
12/14/2005Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 05-24380
01/19/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Christopherson Law Offices. 06-01351
02/09/2006MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: March 31, 2006. 06-02976
03/08/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The briefing schedule shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Respondent may file any reply within 10 days from the date that appellant's response is served. 06-05088
03/27/2006MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 06-06382
04/21/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP06-RR/MD/RP 06-08478
05/17/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-08801
05/17/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/05/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 22, 2006. 06-08801