judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AISHA M. FLIPPING V. D.C. DEP'T OF HUMAN SERVICES

Case Information: 10-AA-0994
Short Caption:AISHA M. FLIPPING V. D.C. DEP'T OF HUMAN SERVICESClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Human Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DHS00284-10Filed Date:08/17/2010

Opening Event Date:08/17/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/05/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/07/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerAisha M. Flipping YPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Human ServicesN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/17/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
08/17/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
08/31/2010ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to August 17, 2010. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (ETW)
08/31/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
07/05/2011RECORD ON APPEAL w/transcript.
07/05/2011RECORD COMPLETED
07/12/2011FiledIt appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the limited appendix, including documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (dlm)
08/19/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)Granted
08/26/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner) 9/22/11
09/28/2011FiledOrder directing motion, brief and appendix
10/27/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
10/27/2011FiledDismissed
03/07/2012FiledMandate