judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CYNTHIA LEE JUROSEK and MICHELLE MARIE v. MICHAEL G. JUROSEK

Case Heading (S-07-0146)
Case Number:S-07-0146Case Docketed On:07/06/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Wills, Decedents' Estates and Probate Code (Title 2)
Short Title:CYNTHIA LEE JUROSEK and MICHELLE MARIE v. MICHAEL G. JUROSEK
Full Title:CYNTHIA LEE JUROSEK and MICHELLE MARIE, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. MICHAEL G. JUROSEK, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCynthia Lee Jurosek Pro Se
AppellantMichelle Marie Pro Se
AppelleeMichael G. JurosekMichael Charles Steel
Jacob L. Brooks

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/06/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/06/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
07/06/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/06/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/13/2007Motion - Dismiss - involuntary and memorandum in support.MotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
07/30/2007Response/Objection - Motion combined motion to dismiss and memorandum in supportResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
07/31/2007Order - Dismiss - involuntaryOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
08/16/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal