judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WERLINGER VS. SORICHETTI

Case Information: 45931
Short Caption:WERLINGER VS. SORICHETTICourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A483624Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/07/2005 / Ashleman, I.R.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/15/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/15/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-18374
09/15/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
09/15/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
09/16/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from McCullough, Perez & Associates, Ltd.--check no. 4935.
09/26/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 05-19056
09/28/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Certified copy filed in district court on 09/14/05. 05-19283
10/07/2005Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: I.R. Ashleman. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/12/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 05-24207
12/19/2005Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. 05-24566
01/03/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/20/05, 06/21/05, and 07/20/05. To Court Reporter: 8th JDC, Dept. III. 06-00122
03/16/2006MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule. 06-05709
03/21/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed March 16, 2006. Appellant shall have until June 19, 2006, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Counsel's caseload will not be deemed such a circumstance. 06-05973
05/26/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to file Transcripts. Mr. Nelson and Ms. Nelson: 30 to file transcripts for June 20, 2005, and July 20, 2005. We direct appellant to pay the required deposit if he has not already done so. The court reporters should immediately notify this court if they do not receive deposit within 10 days from the date of this order. Fn1 [A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] 06-11160
06/05/2006MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 06-11701
07/13/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). fn1[We vacate our May 26, 2006, order that directed court reporters Bill Nelson and Jackie Nelson to produce transcripts.] SNP06-WM/MG/JH 06-14543
07/13/2006Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.