judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KRATZERT VS. LAU

Case Information: 45928
Short Caption:KRATZERT VS. LAUCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A503324Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/15/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/15/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) 05-18340
12/05/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn2[Appellant's failure to file a civil proper person appeal statement constitutes an independent basis for dismissal.] NNP06R-MD/RR/RP 05-23675
12/27/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-23770
12/27/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/05/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 29, 2005. 05-23770