judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: REINSTATEMENT OF JOSE PALLARES

Case Information: 45927
Short Caption:IN RE: REINSTATEMENT OF JOSE PALLARESCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - Reinstatement - Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/15/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/15/2005Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Record of Reinstatement Proceedings, Pleadings and Transcript of Hearings. Vols.1 and 2. 05-18336
12/08/2005Order/Dispositional BarFiled Bar Discipline Order. 'We reinstate Pallares to the active practice of law in Nevada, subject to the conditions described above.' fn 2-[ This is our final disposition of this matter. Any further proceedings concerning Pallares shall be filed under a new docket number.] EN BANC-NB/RR/WM/MG/MD/JH/RP 05-24005
01/03/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-00028
01/03/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/09/2006RemittiturIssued Return Letter. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols 1 and 2 this day. 06-00028
01/20/2006RemittiturFiled Letter: Entered Receipt for Documents. Received by State Bar on January 11, 2006. 06-00028
01/20/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by State Bar on January 4, 2006. 06-00028