Case Information: 90-CF-0419 | |||
Short Caption: | ROBERT MOORE, JR. V. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F9133-89 | Filed Date: | 04/06/1990 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 04/06/1990 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 06/12/1990 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Robert Moore, Jr. | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | D.C. Department of Corrections | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | MOORE JR., ROBERT AKA ROBERT MORRE-BEY D.C. DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS | |||
01/01/1903 | NOTE - 01 04/30/90 ORD: NOT BE DISMISSD NOTE - 01 FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION. SEE NOTE - 02 D.C. CODE SEC. 16-1901. NOTE - 02 | |||
04/06/1990 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
04/06/1990 | PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/30/1990 | ORDER DIRG APLT, W/IN 20 DAYS, TO SHOW CAUSE WHY APPEAL SHOULD (SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 & 2) FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
05/08/1990 | STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING PET. FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS RJG PANEL SCDATE 052190 SCHPRD ANSA | |||
05/17/1990 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition | ||
05/17/1990 | ORDER DISMISS CASE FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 051490 SCHPRD TO | |||
05/17/1990 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE | |||
06/12/1990 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |