Case Information: 91-CF-0719 | |||
Short Caption: | V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F4546-90 | Filed Date: | 06/21/1991 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 06/21/1991 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 08/16/1991 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 05/13/1992 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 10/29/1992 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 12/22/1992 |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Richard S. Devaughn | N |
| |||||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | DEVAUGH, RICHARD S. AKA RICHARD HALL UNITED STATES | |||
01/01/1902 | 3/4 MXBA | |||
06/21/1991 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
07/23/1991 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID H. STRINGER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
08/08/1991 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 081991 SCHPRD DSA | |||
08/08/1991 | ORDER APLT TO FL DSA W/IN 10 DAYS OR VACATE CJA APPT. AD PANELJAC SCDATE 080791 SCHPRD K | |||
08/14/1991 | MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF CRT RPTR RAMOS FOR EXT. OF TM TO FL DECEMBER PROC. TO 11/15/91. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
08/16/1991 | RECORD ON APPEAL PR PANEL SCDATE 082091 SCHPRD R | |||
08/16/1991 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
09/04/1991 | ORDER GR MO OF CT RPTR RAMOS FOR EXT OF TM TO FL TR OF DEC. PROC. TO 11/15/91. NFX. PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/30/1991 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (386 PGS. -- RAMOS) (12/11/90 PROCEEDINGS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/05/1991 | RECEIVED CERT. OF CT RPTR RAMOS FOR 12/11/90 - 12/13/90 PROC. RE: DUPLICATE REQUEST. PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/12/1991 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (40 PGS. - TANNER) (12/17/90 PROC.) PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/23/1991 | ORDER BRF OF APLT TO BE FILED IN 40 AND BRF OF APLE DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFTER.AC PANELRBH SCDATE 121391 SCHPRD K | |||
02/03/1992 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 020392 SCHPRD BA | |||
02/24/1992 | ORDER APLT MO X TM FL BRF TO 3/4/92 GRNTD. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 021192 SCHPRD GR | |||
03/04/1992 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 030492 SCHPRD BA | |||
03/13/1992 | Grant the motion of appellant for an extension of time within which to file his brief and the brief of appellant shall be filed on or before April 3, 1992. Any further request for an extension of time will be looked upon disfavor and granted only in extraordinary circumstances. (By JAC) | |||
04/13/1992 | APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (no oppo). | |||
04/13/1992 | RECEIVED appellant's brief | |||
04/22/1992 | ORDER GRANTING APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF Lodged brief of appellant of appellant is herey filed. Brief of appellee shall be filed on or before May 13, 1992. | |||
04/22/1992 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF | |||
05/13/1992 | APPELLEE'S BRIEF | |||
05/13/1992 | BRIEFS COMPLETED | |||
06/11/1992 | FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I | |||
10/29/1992 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
10/29/1992 | SUBMITTED FE ST FA | |||
10/30/1992 | AFFIRMED MOJ (FE ST FA) | |||
12/22/1992 | MANDATE ISSUED |