judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GRIFF VS. YOUNG

Case Information: 45929
Short Caption:GRIFF VS. YOUNGCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A464533Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:SaittaCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/19/2006How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/15/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/15/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) 05-18348
10/17/2005BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. 05-20465
10/25/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due in District Court Case No. A464533: 120 days. 05-21150
01/19/2006Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 06-01459
01/19/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/09/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Response due: 30 days. 06-20635
11/08/2006MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Answering Brief. 06-22796
11/28/2006OtherDisqualification of Justice Saitta. Sat in district court proceedings.
12/07/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER we AFFIRM the district court's order." NNP07B-NB/JH/RP. Fn5 [In light of this order we deny as moot respondents' motion to dismiss filed on November 8, 2006.] 06-24993
01/03/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-00087
01/03/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 8, 2007. 07-00087