judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WEBB (TIMOTHY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45923
Short Caption:WEBB (TIMOTHY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C95684Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/12/2005How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/14/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/14/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 05-18264
10/03/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Certified copy of final order due: 30 days. Certified copy of the record on appeal due: 60 days. 05-19531
12/02/2005Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on November 29, 2005. 05-23622
12/12/2005Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 23. 05-24254
12/12/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/06/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP06-WM/MG/JH 06-00294
01/31/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-01337
01/31/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/02/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 3, 2006. 06-01337