judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GIARDINA (FRANK) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45922
Short Caption:GIARDINA (FRANK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 43685 , 45921
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C192200Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/14/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/14/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 05-18262
10/17/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn2[We have received all proper person documents submitted in this matter, and conclude that no relief is warranted.] NNP06R-MD/RR/RP 05-20401
11/08/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Denying Request. On October 20, 2005, this court received a proper person letter apparently requesting transcripts. The request is denied. 05-21981
11/15/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-20706
11/15/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 22, 2005. 05-20706