judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GASTON (OSSIE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42019
Short Caption:GASTON (OSSIE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C191394Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/10/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/10/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 03-15192
09/10/2003Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 6/17/03 through 6/17/03. Court Reporter: Angela Lee. Filed in district court on: September 5, 2003. 03-15193
09/25/2003TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: June 17 and 18, 2003. Court Reporter: Angela Lee. 03-16071
11/18/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, no fast track statement has been filed. Appellant's counsel Craig F. Jorgenson shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 03-19177
12/08/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 03-20428
12/08/2003AppendixReceived Appendix. 03-20430
12/22/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed December 8, 2003. The clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on December 8, 2003. 03-21193
12/22/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 03-20429
12/22/2003AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 03-20430
12/23/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 03-21335
03/01/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP04S-MS/RR/WM 04-03798
03/26/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-04053
03/26/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/09/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 29, 2004. 04-04053