judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SMITH (DAVID) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42018
Short Caption:SMITH (DAVID) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 40552
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C149175Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/10/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/10/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 03-15187
09/10/2003Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: June 9, 2003. To Court Reporter: Sonia Riley. 03-15188
11/18/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, no fast track statement has been filed. Appellant's counsel Gary E. Gowen shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 03-19176
12/08/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 03-20406
12/30/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed December 8, 2003. Counsel for appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order within which to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. 03-21619
01/21/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, no fast track statement has been filed. Appellant's counsel Gary E. Gowen shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 04-01184
02/04/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 04-02238
02/09/2004MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Appellant's Motion for Leave to File A Fast Track Statement Having 15 Pages. Granted: 15 pages. 04-02526
02/09/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Fourth Motion for Enlargement of Time. 04-02527
02/13/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed February 4, 2004 and February 9, 2004. The clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on February 9, 2004. 04-02867
02/13/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 04-02528
02/13/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Volumes 1 and 2. 04-02529
03/04/2004MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 16 Page Fast Track Response. 04-04062
03/08/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed March 4, 2004. The clerk shall file the 16-page fast track response received on March 4, 2004. 04-04315
03/08/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 04-04063
05/25/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Counsel for Smith shall have 20 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. 04-09660
06/07/2004MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 04-10475
06/28/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED."fn8[Although this court has elected to file the appendix submitted, we note that it does not comply with the arrangement and form requirements of the Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure. Failure to comply with the requirements for appendices in the future may result in the appendix being returned, unfiled, to be correctly prepared. See NRAP 32 (c). Failure to comply may also result in the imposition of sanctions by this court. See NRAP 3C(n).] NNP04-NB/DA/MG 04-11757
07/23/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-11939
07/23/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/03/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 26, 2004. 04-11939