judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOHN GARNER III V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 91-CF-0832
Short Caption:JOHN GARNER III V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Lead: 91-CF-0575 Consolidated:91-CF-0832
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6531-90Filed Date:07/22/1991

Opening Event Date:07/22/1991Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/17/1991Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/09/1992
Argued/Submitted:09/01/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/22/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Garner, IIIN
Allen H. Orenberg NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GARNER III, JOHN UNITED STATES
01/01/1902
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: KURTIS L. GRAY - 91-832 NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 CONS. 91-575 NOTE - 02
05/10/1991NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/22/1991NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/07/1991APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ALLEN H. ORENBERG, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/20/1991ORDER SS, APPEAL IS CONS. W/91-575. AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/30/1991ORDER CNSL FR APLT TO FL DSA IN NO. 91-832 IN 10 DAYS OR APMT VACATED. EVH PANELRO SCDATE 081991 SCHPRD DSA
09/03/1991APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 091091 SCHPRD DSA
09/17/1991RECORD ON APPEAL PMB PANEL SCDATE 092391 SCHPRD R
09/17/1991RECORD COMPLETED
01/30/1992ORDER APLT TO FL BRF IN 40 AND APLE BRF DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFTER IN BOTH APPEALS. AC PANELRBH SCDATE 012992 SCHPRD K
02/18/1992MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO ADOPT BY REFERENCE IN ITS ENTIRETY APLT'S ORIGNAL BR FILED BY KURTIS GRAY AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1992APPELLANT'S BRIEF BRF IN 91-575 DEEMED AS BRIEF OF APPELLANT IN THIS APPEAL. AC PANELRO SCDATE 031092 SCHPRD BA
03/09/1992ORDER GR APLT MO TO ADOPT BRF OF APLT IN 91-575 AS BRF OF APLT IN THIS APPEAL. BE DUE IN 30. PANELRO SCDATE 030492 SCHPRD TO
04/09/1992APPELLEE'S BRIEF
04/09/1992BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/06/1992FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR II
05/07/1992NOTICE SENT SUM II: RQST TO PRSNT ORAL ARGMNT - 10 DYS TO RSPND.
09/01/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/01/1992SUBMITTED (ST/MK/NW)
09/30/1992AFFIRMED MOJ (ST MK NW)
10/22/1992MANDATE ISSUED
06/30/1993RECEIVED pro se letter from appellant re: denial of his appeal.
08/18/1993LETTER to appellant pro se forwarding a copy of the MOJ entered in this appeal. (JAC)
12/06/1994RECEIVED pro-se letter in re to a motion to vacate judgement.