judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ESMERALDA CO. CLASSROOM TEACHERS ASS'N VS. ESMERALDA CO. SCHOOL DIST.

Case Information: 42009
Short Caption:ESMERALDA CO. CLASSROOM TEACHERS ASS'N VS. ESMERALDA CO. SCHOOL DIST.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Esmeralda Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CV034928Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:MaupinCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/17/2003 / Yott, LaurieSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/09/2003OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. Law firm of Dyer, Lawrence, Penrose, Flaherty & Donaldson.
09/09/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Dyer, Lawrence, Penrose, Flaherty & Donaldson--check no. 1843.
09/09/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-15096
09/10/2003Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/23/03. To Court Reporter: Jeanie Wright. 03-15179
09/17/2003Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Laurie A. Yott. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/17/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-15539
09/19/2003Notice/Outgoing Letter. Laurie A. Yott. (docketing statement)
09/22/2003TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 23, 2003. Court Reporter: Jeanie Wright. 03-15796
10/24/2003MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 03-17747
11/13/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 03-18942
11/13/2003Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.