Case Information: 91-CF-0814 | |||
Short Caption: | PRISCILLA A. MARTIN V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F6139-89 | Filed Date: | 07/15/1991 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 07/15/1991 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 09/05/1991 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 06/30/1992 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 12/01/1992 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 01/11/1993 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Priscilla A. Martin | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | MARTIN, PRISCILLA A. UNITED STATES | |||
01/01/1902 | NFX | |||
01/01/1903 | NOTE - 01 CODEF: WILLIAM A. NOBLE NOTE - 01 | |||
07/15/1991 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
07/30/1991 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PHYLLIS J. BARON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
08/07/1991 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 080991 SCHPRD DSA | |||
09/05/1991 | RECORD ON APPEAL PMB PANEL SCDATE 091691 SCHPRD R | |||
09/05/1991 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
09/13/1991 | MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF CRT RPTR FINNERIN FOR EXT. OF TM TO FL TRIAL PROC. TO 10/15/91. PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
09/24/1991 | ORDER DEY CT RPTR FINNERIN'S MOTION AS UNTIMELY FILED. PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/02/1992 | ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE W/IN 40 DAYS & BRF OF APLE DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFTER. NFX. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 022492 SCHPRD B | |||
04/09/1992 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS | |||
04/23/1992 | ORD GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and the brief of appellant shall be filed on or before May 22, 1992. No requests for an extension of time will be granted absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances. (JAC) | |||
05/26/1992 | APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF | |||
05/26/1992 | RECEIVED appellant's brief. | |||
06/24/1992 | RECEIVED - appellee brief | |||
06/30/1992 | Grant motion of appellant for leave to file her brief and the brief is filed; The lodged brief of appellee is filed and this appeal shall be scheduled before a merits division as soon as the calendar permits. (By JAC) | |||
06/30/1992 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF | |||
06/30/1992 | APPELLEE'S BRIEF | |||
06/30/1992 | BRIEFS COMPLETED | |||
08/04/1992 | FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR II | |||
08/06/1992 | NOTICE SENT Request to present oral argument - 10 days to respond. | |||
12/01/1992 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
12/01/1992 | SUBMITTED FE KN MK | |||
12/04/1992 | AFFIRMED MOJ affirming the judgment on appeal. FE KN MK | |||
01/11/1993 | MANDATE ISSUED |