judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WACKERLY (MICHAEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42008
Short Caption:WACKERLY (MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 47033 , 47374
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR010873Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/22/2004How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/09/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/09/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 03-15093
09/12/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. If appellant is indigent, the district court shall have 30 days within which to appoint counsel for appellant. Otherwise, the district court shall order that, within 30 days, appellant must retain counsel and counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. Within 5 days from appointment or appearance of counsel the district court clerk shall transmit to this court a copy of the district court's written or minute order, and serve a copy of this order on appellant's counsel. Thereafter, counsel shall have 10 days to file a notice of appearance in this court. fn2[All filing deadlines shall commence to run from the date on which counsel is required to enter an appearance in this court.] 03-15292
09/22/2003Other Returned Mail. Receipt for documents dated 09/09/03 addressed to Michael Wackerly returned. No forwarding address.
09/25/2003Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on September 22, 2003 appointing Washoe County Public Defender as counsel for appellant. 03-16065
09/25/2003Other Returned Mail. Order filed 09/12/03 addressed to Michael Wackerly returned. No forwarding address.
09/25/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: John Petty, Chief Deputy Public Defender, Washoe County Public Defender's office. 03-16074
09/25/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-16075
09/25/2003Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 03-16076
01/21/2004MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: February 19, 2004. 04-01269
02/12/2004BriefFiled Opening Brief. 04-02788
02/12/2004AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 04-02789
02/19/2004BriefFiled Answering Brief. 04-03209
02/20/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Election Not to File a Reply Brief. 04-03352
03/22/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 04-05334
03/22/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/13/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP04-NB/DA/MG 04-06815
05/11/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-07271
05/11/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/16/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 12, 2004. 04-07271