judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DIAZ (JESUS) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45945
Short Caption:DIAZ (JESUS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - CRFP05580Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/16/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/16/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 05-18460
09/16/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: August 22, 2005. Court Reporter: Lisa Manley. Filed in district court on: September 12, 2005. 05-18462
10/26/2005Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: November 2, 2005. 05-21201
10/31/2005TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: August 22, 2005. Court Reporter: Lisa Manley. 05-21440
11/07/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 05-21892
11/07/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 05-21896
11/28/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 05-23287
03/14/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP06-WM/MG/JH 06-05497
04/11/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-06037
04/11/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/20/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 16, 2006. 06-06037